+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (22)
On September 25, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter 106, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 01, 2021.
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 36; Nays, 20--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Nearman, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 4--Evans, Helm, Sanchez, Smith G.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
- Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 19; Nays, 9--Anderson, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Gelser, Thatcher.
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Housing and Development.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed. Ayes, 38; Nays, 21--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Nearman, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 1--Clem.
- Motion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 35--Alonso Leon, Bynum, Campos, Dexter, Evans, Fahey, Gomberg, Grayber, Helm, Holvey, Hudson, Kropf, Lively, Marsh, McLain, Meek, Nathanson, Neron, Nosse, Pham, Power, Prusak, Rayfield, Reynolds, Ruiz, Salinas, Sanchez, Schouten, Smith Warner, Sollman, Speaker Kotek, Valderrama, Wilde, Williams, Witt; Absent, 1--Reardon; Excused, 1--Clem.
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Minority Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (10)
Amendment -MR8
Proposed (3/26/2021 4:53 PM)
Amendment A10
Proposed (5/4/2021 12:14 PM)
Amendment A-11
Proposed (4/27/2021 6:00 PM)
Amendment A12
Adopted (5/4/2021 11:43 AM)
Amendment -6
Proposed (3/24/2021 11:29 AM)
Amendment -MR7
Proposed (3/26/2021 4:18 PM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (3/19/2021 5:21 PM)
Amendment -3
Adopted (3/19/2021 5:19 PM)
Amendment -5
Proposed (3/24/2021 9:17 AM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (3/19/2021 5:21 PM)