+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (31)
On August 14, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 645, (2019 Laws): Effective date August 9, 2019.
On August 9, 2019 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 2, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Gelser, excused, granted unanimous consent to vote aye.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 11--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boles, Boquist, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Knopp, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum.
- Second reading.
On June 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by McKeown, Mitchell.
- Third reading. Carried by Power. Passed. Ayes, 44; Nays, 15--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Drazan, Hayden, Lewis, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 1--Clem.
- Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Boshart Davis.
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 21, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On June 17, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules by order of Speaker and then Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Rules, and then to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Energy and Environment with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (5)
Amendment -A11
Recommended (6/19/2019 9:23 AM)
Amendment -A12
Adopted (6/20/2019 4:58 PM)
Amendment -A7
Recommended (6/19/2019 8:15 AM)
Amendment -A10
Recommended (6/19/2019 8:04 AM)
Amendment -1
Adopted (5/15/2019 8:48 AM)