+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
- In committee upon adjournment.
- Referred to Rules by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Rules.
- Work Session held.
- Work Session held.
- Work Session held.
- Public Hearing held.
- Referred to Business and Labor.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (50)
Amendment #6022
4/17/2015 2:33:59 PM
Amendment #6021
4/17/2015 2:33:59 PM
Amendment #6007
4/17/2015 12:02:41 PM
Amendment #6006
4/17/2015 12:02:41 PM
Amendment #6005
4/17/2015 12:02:41 PM
Amendment #6004
4/17/2015 12:02:41 PM
Amendment #6003
4/17/2015 12:02:41 PM
Amendment #6002
4/17/2015 12:02:41 PM
Amendment #6001
4/17/2015 12:02:41 PM
Amendment #6000
4/17/2015 12:02:41 PM
Amendment #5999
4/17/2015 12:02:41 PM
Amendment #5998
4/17/2015 12:02:40 PM
Amendment #5997
4/17/2015 12:02:40 PM
Amendment #5996
4/17/2015 12:02:40 PM
Amendment #5995
4/17/2015 12:02:40 PM
Amendment #5934
4/16/2015 3:56:54 PM
Amendment #4824
3/25/2015 4:06:44 PM
Amendment #4823
3/25/2015 8:23:17 AM
Amendment #4822
3/25/2015 8:23:17 AM
Amendment #4821
3/25/2015 7:54:33 AM
Amendment #4820
3/24/2015 3:20:46 PM
Amendment #4818
3/24/2015 3:20:46 PM
Amendment #4819
3/24/2015 3:20:46 PM
Amendment #4817
3/24/2015 3:20:46 PM
Amendment #4816
3/24/2015 3:20:46 PM
Amendment #4815
3/24/2015 3:20:46 PM
Amendment #4814
3/24/2015 3:20:46 PM
Amendment #4813
3/24/2015 3:20:46 PM
Amendment #4812
3/24/2015 3:20:46 PM
Amendment #4811
3/24/2015 3:20:46 PM
Amendment #4810
3/24/2015 3:20:46 PM
Amendment #4768
3/25/2015 8:23:17 AM
Amendment #4767
3/25/2015 8:23:17 AM
Amendment #4757
3/25/2015 7:54:33 AM
Amendment #4756
3/25/2015 7:06:47 AM
Amendment #4741
3/24/2015 3:20:46 PM
Amendment #4740
3/24/2015 3:20:46 PM
Amendment #4739
3/24/2015 3:20:46 PM
Amendment #4738
3/24/2015 3:20:46 PM
Amendment #4737
3/24/2015 3:20:46 PM
Amendment #4736
3/24/2015 3:20:46 PM
Amendment #4735
3/24/2015 3:20:46 PM
Amendment #4734
3/24/2015 3:20:46 PM
Amendment #4733
3/24/2015 3:20:46 PM
Amendment #4732
3/24/2015 3:20:46 PM
Amendment #4731
3/24/2015 3:20:46 PM
Amendment #4697
3/20/2015 2:34:31 PM
Amendment #4695
3/23/2015 1:58:47 PM
Amendment #4696
3/23/2015 1:58:47 PM
Amendment #4632
3/20/2015 2:34:31 PM