+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 197, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017.
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Barreto, Hack.
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Boone, McKeown.
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation filed by Thomsen.
- Third reading. Carried by Taylor, Knopp. Passed. Ayes, 30.
- Made a Special Order of Business by voice vote.
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Informational Meeting scheduled.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Workforce.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Lininger. Passed. Ayes, 36; Nays, 24--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Whisnant, Wilson.
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Alonso Leon, Barnhart, Bynum, Doherty, Evans, Fahey, Gomberg, Gorsek, Helm, Holvey, Keny-Guyer, Malstrom, Marsh, McKeown, McLain, Meek, Nathanson, Piluso, Rayfield, Sanchez, Sollman, Williamson.
- Motion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed. Ayes, 29; Nays, 31--Alonso Leon, Barker, Barnhart, Bynum, Doherty, Evans, Fahey, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Hernandez, Holvey, Keny-Guyer, Lininger, Lively, Malstrom, Marsh, McKeown, McLain, Meek, Nathanson, Nosse, Piluso, Power, Rayfield, Sanchez, Smith Warner, Sollman, Williamson, Speaker Kotek.
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Minority Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (14)
Amendment -A31
Adopted (5/10/2017 12:45:45 PM)
Amendment -26
Proposed (5/1/2017 12:25:10 PM)
Amendment -MR20
Proposed (3/23/2017 12:39:44 PM)
Amendment -17
Proposed (3/20/2017 12:04:46 PM)
Amendment -15
Proposed (3/20/2017 12:03:23 PM)
Amendment -16
Proposed (3/20/2017 12:03:58 PM)
Amendment -14
Proposed (3/20/2017 12:02:30 PM)
Amendment -11
Proposed (3/20/2017 10:50:33 AM)
Amendment -18
Proposed (3/20/2017 12:00:54 PM)
Amendment -19
Proposed (3/20/2017 10:50:45 AM)
Amendment -7
Proposed (3/16/2017 3:44:29 PM)
Amendment -8
Proposed (3/16/2017 3:45:23 PM)
Amendment -6
Proposed (3/13/2017 10:11:51 AM)
Amendment -5
Adopted (3/15/2017 4:59:18 PM)
+ − Sponsors (44)
Type:
Primary Sponsor