+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 20, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ835ER)
On February 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
- Taken up
On February 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 2, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On January 29, 2001 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 015870748-E
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 015870748
+ − Sponsors (100)
Type:
Primary Sponsor