+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On August 1, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ258ER)
On February 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
- Taken up
On January 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 26, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 967470198
+ − Sponsors (87)
Type:
Primary Sponsor