+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 9, 1995 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ307ER)
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 30, 1995 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
On January 27, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 26, 1995 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
- Taken up
On January 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented LD0003753
+ − Sponsors (89)
Type:
Primary Sponsor