+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ474ER)
On January 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
- Taken up
On January 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 15, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On January 13, 1999 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 990405323
- Prefiled; 09/08/98