+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 9, 1995 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ382ER)
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
- Laid on Speaker's table
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 1995 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate
- Engrossed by Senate
- Taken up
On January 27, 1995 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented LD5439695
- Consent to introduce (36-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (83)
Type:
Primary Sponsor