+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date 05/15/15
- Chapter number 25
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date 05/15/15
- Secretary of State Chapter 25 05/14/15
- Governor's action Approval 05/14/15
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Governor approval 05/14/15
- Secretary of State, Filed 05/14/15
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/11/15
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 05/11/15
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading
- Senate concurred and repassed bill
- Returned from House with amendment
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Point of order raised, ruled well taken
- Third reading as amended
- Bill was passed as amended
- Amended
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 06, 2015
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
- Second reading
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate
- Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF1429
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed
- Special Order: Amended
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Author added Weber
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Energy
- Introduction and first reading