+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (54)
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- See also SF 1664, Sec. 15, 24-25
- Secretary of State Chapter 108 05/23/13
- Governor's action Approval 05/23/13
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter number 108
- Secretary of State, Filed 5/23/2013
- Governor approval 5/23/2013
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date Various Dates
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 05/22/13
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/22/13
On May 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report, delete everything
- House adopted HCC report and repassed bill
- Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill
- Third reading (vote: 39-28)
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed (vote: 39-28)
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Bill was repassed as amended by Conference (vote: 73-61)
- Third reading as amended by Conference
- House adopted conference committee report
- Motion to adopt conference committee report (vote: 73-57)
- Conference committee report, delete everything
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Loeffler
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Senate conferees Lourey, Sheran, Hayden, Franzen, Wiklund
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate conferees Lourey; Sheran; Hayden; Franzen; Wiklund
- Senate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed
- House conferees Huntley; Liebling; Loeffler; Moran; Abeler
- House not concur, conference committee of 5 requested
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Senate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with amendment
- House refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested
- House conferees Huntley, Liebling, Loeffler, Moran, Abeler
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Special Order: Amended
- Third reading Passed (vote: 36-28)
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF1034
- Second reading
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1034, now on General Orders
- Introduction and first reading
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Amendments offered
- Point of order raised, ruled not well taken question submitted to the body (vote: 60-70)
- Motion to lay on the table Morgan amendment
- Motion did not prevail
- Amended
- Point of order raised, ruled not well taken
- House rule 2.05, member excused from voting Barrett
- Third reading as amended
- Bill was passed as amended (vote: 70-64)
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 22, 2013
- Second reading
- Committee report, to pass as amended
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Isaacson
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Ward, J.E.
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Moran
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Rules and Legislative Administration