+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (41)
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On May 27, 2016 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Referred for enrollment
On May 27, 2016 in the House:
- To Senate
- Motion expired
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Mulready
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 30
- CCR adopted
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- CCR adopted
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- CCR submitted
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 30 Nays: 14
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title restored
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- CCR read
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Rules
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- SCs named Jolley, Justice, Bice, Holt, Bass, Bingman, Floyd
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- HAs rejected, conference requested
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Title stricken
- General Order
- Amended
- Motion expired
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 30
- Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Mulready
- Referred for engrossment
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
- Title restored
- Measure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 16
- Referred for engrossment
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Mulready (principal House author)
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Bingman, Bice
- Authored by Senator Jolley
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (18)
+ − Votes (3)
May 23, 2016: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 4
April 6, 2016: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
March 1, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 16
- Absent: 4