+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 9
- HAs adopted
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 22
- General Order
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
- Title restored
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 12
- General Order, Considered
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Pugh
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
April 25, 2018: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 4
April 12, 2018: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
March 13, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor