+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/29/2013
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett, Ritze, Enns
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 3
- General Order
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Allen
- CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Ivester
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Jackson (principal House author)
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Anderson
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
April 22, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 6
March 25, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8