+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Adopted, returned to Senate
- Considered
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Adopted, referred for engrossment
- Considered
- Direct to Calendar
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Remove as principal author Representative Perryman and substitute with Representative Hill
- Coauthored by Representative Boles, Hill
- Coauthored by Representative Perryman (principal House author)
- Authored by Senator Paxton
- First Reading
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor