+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Adopted, returned to Senate
- Considered
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Adopted, referred for engrossment
- Coauthored by all other Senators
- Considered
- Direct to Calendar
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Echols (principal House author)
- Authored by Senator Crain
- First Reading
+ − Sponsors (49)
Type:
Primary Sponsor