+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Withdrawn from Judiciary Committee
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Shortey
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 6
- General Order, Considered
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Sykes
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Murphey (principal House author)
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Jolley
- First Reading