+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Moore
- Referred for enrollment
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Adopted, returned to Senate
- Considered
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by all other Senators
- Adopted, referred for engrossment
- Considered
- Direct to Calendar
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Banz (principal House author)
- Authored by Senator Sharp
- First Reading
+ − Sponsors (50)
Type:
Primary Sponsor