+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Adopted, returned to Senate
- Coauthored by all other Representatives except Dollens, Albright, Ranson, Provenzano, Loring, Nichols, Virgin, Brewer, Goodwin, Rosecrants, Waldron, Stone, Munson, Bennett, Perryman, Branham
- Considered
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Adopted, referred for engrossment
- Coauthored by Senator Allen, Bergstrom, Bice, Boggs, Bullard, Coleman, Daniels, David, Dossett, Dugger, Hall, Haste, Howard, Ikley-Freeman, Jech, Kidd, Leewright, McCortney, Montgomery, Murdock, Newhouse, Paxton, Pederson, Pemberton, Pugh, Quinn, Rader, Rosino, Scott, Sharp, Shaw, Silk, Simpson, Smalley, Stanislawski, Stanley, Thompson, Weaver
- Considered
- Direct to Calendar
- Coauthored by Senator Dahm
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
- Authored by Senator Standridge
- First Reading
+ − Sponsors (122)
Type:
Primary Sponsor