+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Remains on Third Reading
- Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 28 Nays: 8
- Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Murdock
- Measure failed: Ayes: 11 Nays: 31
- General Order, Amended
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Leewright
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative McDugle (principal House author)
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Murdock
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (2)
March 13, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 31
- Absent: 6
March 13, 2019: Senate Reconsider
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor