+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Tourism
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 1
- General Order, Considered
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Bice
- First Reading
+ − Vote
March 13, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 6