+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/26/2019
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
- Amendment restores bill to engrossed version
- Title restored
- Amended
- General Order
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Title stricken
- CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 4
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative West (Tammy) (principal House author)
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Smalley
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 17, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 92
- Absent: 9
April 10, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 29
April 1, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 6
March 11, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 5