+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Caldwell (Trey) (principal House author)
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Boren
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 4, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
March 9, 2022: Senate Valuation Of Certain Property. Effective Date.
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor