+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/21/2016
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Sent to Governor
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 1
- General Order
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
- Referred for engrossment
- Emergency clause restored
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Lepak (principal House author)
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Emergency clause stricken
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Select Agencies sub-committee
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appr/Sub-Select Agencies
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Stanislawski
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 5, 2016: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 20
March 30, 2016: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8
March 8, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor