+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/21/2016
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 0
- General Order
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1
- General Order, Considered
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Thomsen (principal House author)
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Paddack
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 7, 2016: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11
March 9, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor