+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/27/2021
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 3
- General Order
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Stark
- CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Health
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
- Coauthored by Senator Garvin
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Miller (principal House author)
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Stanley
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
April 20, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 10
March 31, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10
February 9, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor