+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/05/2016
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0
- HAs adopted
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 0; Ayes: 76 Nays: 0
- General Order
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Roberts (Dustin) (principal House author)
- Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Simpson
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 28, 2016: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Absent: 9
March 30, 2016: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 26
March 22, 2016: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10
February 23, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor