+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/15/2013
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Sent to Governor
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 16
- General Order
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- General Order, Amended
- Referred for engrossment
- Title restored
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Emergency added
- Title stricken
- Coauthored by Martin (Scott) (principal House author)
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Standridge
- Remove as author Senator Standridge; authored by Senator Bingman
- Second Reading referred to Finance
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Standridge
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 8, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 16
- Absent: 5
March 28, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 1
February 21, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Absent: 6