+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/27/2021
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
- General Order
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) McEntire
- CR; Do Pass General Government Committee
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
- General Order, Considered
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Mize (principal House author)
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Hall
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 21, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 86
- Absent: 15
April 7, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8
March 1, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor