+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Enacting clause stricken
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
- Title stricken
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Common Education
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
- Emergency clause restored
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
- Referred for engrossment
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Baker (principal House author)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Emergency clause stricken
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Bice
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Votes (2)
April 12, 2018: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 5
March 13, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor