+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/20/2019
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 7
- HAs adopted
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 7
- Title restored
- Amended
- House Rule suspended
- General Order
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 4
- General Order, Considered
- Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Bice
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
May 14, 2019: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 3
April 23, 2019: House Suspend House Rules
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 17
April 23, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 9
April 10, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 14
March 13, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 7