+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Roberts (Dustin) (principal House author)
- Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Simpson
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
March 22, 2016: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
February 23, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor