+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Ivester
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- Referred for engrossment
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Osborn (principal House author)
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Sykes
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 19, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 3
March 5, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor