+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/29/2013
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0
- General Order
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Shaw
- CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Derby (principal House author)
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Brinkley
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
April 22, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 4
April 9, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 16
March 7, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor