+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Remove as author Senator Dahm; authored by Senator Bergstrom
- HAs read
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Remove as coauthor Senator Bergstrom
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 13
- Amended
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Manger, Roberts (Sean)
- General Order
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Jett
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by McDugle
- Referred for engrossment
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 8
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by West (Kevin)
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Allen
- Coauthored by Senator Stephens
- Coauthored by Representative Steagall (principal House author)
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
- Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
- Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Dahm
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
April 22, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 13
- Absent: 11
March 31, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor