+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Yen
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Standridge
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Echols (principal House author)
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
- Second Reading referred to Finance
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Mazzei
- Remove as author Senator Mazzei; authored by Thompson
- Coauthored by Quinn
- Authored by Senator Mazzei
- First Reading