+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/28/2021
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- To Senate
- CCR adopted
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 18
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Referred for enrollment
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- CCR submitted
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 30 Nays: 17
- CCR adopted, GCCA
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- CCR read, GCCA
- Enacting clause restored
- Title restored
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Conference granted, naming GCCA
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- SCs named GCCA
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- HAs rejected, conference requested
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 15
- General Order
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
- Enacting clause stricken
- Title stricken
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 17
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Caldwell (Trey) (principal House author)
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Hall
- Remove as author Senator Hall; authored by Senator Howard
- Authored by Senator Hall
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
April 21, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 18
April 14, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 32
April 5, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor