+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Ivester, Brecheen
- CR; Do Pass Long-term Care and Senior Services Committee
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Long-term Care and Senior Services
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Johnson (principal House author)
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Sykes
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 2, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
March 5, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Absent: 6