+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Utility and Environmental Regulation
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Remove as coauthor Senator Johnson (Rob)
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- Emergency removed
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Remove as principal author Representative Bennett and substitute with Representative Joyner
- Remove as principal author Representative Schwartz and substitute with Representative Bennett
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Johnson (Rob)
- Remove as author Senator Johnson (Rob); authored by Senator Allen
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Emergency added
- Title stricken
- Coauthored by Schwartz (principal House author)
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Energy
- Withdrawn from Rules committee
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Johnson (Rob)
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
March 12, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor