+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1
- General Order, Considered
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Cleveland (principal House author)
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Shaw
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
March 21, 2018: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10
March 6, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor