+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/20/2021
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
- General Order
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author)
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Leewright
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
April 13, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 93
- Absent: 8
March 31, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 29