+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/14/2019
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- HAs adopted
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 2
- General Order
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Title restored
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Ortega (principal House author)
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- Withdrawn from Public Safety committee
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Howard
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
May 7, 2019: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 4
April 16, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 9
April 4, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
March 7, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 4