+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/12/2021
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1
- HAs adopted
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 5
- Amended
- House Rule suspended
- General Order
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Insurance
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2
- Title restored
- Emergency added
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Sneed (principal House author)
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Quinn
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (3)
April 21, 2021: House Suspend House Rules
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 30
April 21, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 9
April 7, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8