+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/11/2016
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Sent to Governor
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 5
- General Order
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Dossett, Pittman
- CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Emergency added
- General Order, Amended
- Referred for engrossment
- Title restored
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Kannady
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Roberts (Dustin) (principal House author)
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Simpson
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (2)
March 22, 2016: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
March 3, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 5