+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/07/2021
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0
- HAs adopted
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Manger
- HAs read
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 1
- General Order
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
- Emergency added
- General Order, Amended
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Hardin (Tommy) (principal House author)
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Pugh
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 21, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 15
March 30, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor