+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/27/2021
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0
- General Order
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Hardin (Tommy) (principal House author)
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Pugh
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
April 21, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 87
- Absent: 14
March 30, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
March 2, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 2