+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- CCR read
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Remove as principal author Representative Talley and substitute with Representative Steagall
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Remove as author Senator Dugger; authored by Senator Rosino
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on County and Municipal Government
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- SCs named Dugger, Rosino, Weaver, Haste, Floyd, Young
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- HAs rejected, conference requested
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Manger
- General Order
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Emergency added
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
- Coauthored by Representative Talley (principal House author)
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Dugger
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 21, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 87
- Absent: 14
April 5, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8
March 4, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor