+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
- General Order
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1
- General Order, Considered
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author)
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Jech
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
April 23, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 93
- Absent: 8
March 26, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 16