+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 06/01/2015
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Referred for enrollment
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 2; Ayes: 68 Nays: 9
- JCR adopted
- General Order
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- JCR adopted
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed
- Emergency added
- Engrossed to House
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 7
- Referred for engrossment
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Casey
- Coauthored by Sears (principal House author)
- Coauthored by Treat
- Authored by Senator Jolley
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 22, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 25
May 22, 2015: House Emergency
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 22