+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Turner (principal House author)
- Authored by Senator Treat
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
March 25, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 13
February 25, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor